Coleman v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Robert L Coleman
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation, Logistic Services Inc and Severstal U S Holdings LLC
Cross_claimant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Cross_defendant: Logistic Services Inc and Severstal U S Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00225
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Kinder Morgan Energy Partners and Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals' motions for summary judgment, document number 98 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and document number 84 in case number 3:15-cv-00350. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2016. (jak)
October 28, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The motions for extension of time filed by LSI, SDI Columbus, and Cooper Marine are granted. Documents 100 , 101 , and 102 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and Documents 87, 88, and 89 in case 3:15-cv-00350. These parties have until seven days after the Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of thirdparty defendants Dawson and Temps Plus are completed to file their responses to KMEP and Kinder Morgan's motions for summary judgment, Documents 98 & 84.. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/2016. (jak)
October 21, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: These cases are scheduled for trial beginning 4/3/2017 and 4/24/2017. The motions for continuance are granted; Document number 96 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and document number 83 in case 3:15-cv-00350. Case No. 3:15-cv-00225 is removed from the trial docket for the week of 4/3/2017. Case No. 3:15-cv-00350 is removed from the trial docket for the week of 4/24/2017. The scheduling orders in those cases are hereby set aside. New scheduling orders will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/2016. (jak)
September 7, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting to the extent stated in this Order but otherwise denying 61 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/2016. (jak)
September 2, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the request for a stay. The deposition may not be conducted until the Court rules on the motion for protective order. Plaintiff's are directed to file their response to the motion for protective order as promptly as possible. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/2016. (jak)
January 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' joint motion to consolidate the three actions in the caption of this Order for discovery purposes only. Case No. 3:15-cv-00170-JLH will be the lead case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Coleman
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: Brent L. Probinsky
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logistic Services Inc
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Richard P. Salloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severstal U S Holdings LLC
Represented By: Gregory W. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Logistic Services Inc
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Richard P. Salloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Severstal U S Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?