Osby v. Craighead County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Osby
Defendant: Craighead County Sheriff's Department and Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00246
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Osby's claims against the Craighead County Sheriff's Department are dismissed with prejudice. Osby's official-capacity claims against Hall, Boyd, Jackson, and Harrell are dismissed without prejudice. Osby's individual-capacity claims against Hall, Boyd, Jackson, and Harrell are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/30/2016. (jak)
February 17, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 partial recommendation; dismissing with prejudice Osby's claims against the Craighead County Sheriff's Department; and dismissing without prejudice his official-capacity claims against Defendants Hall, Boyd, Chasity, and Todd. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/17/2016. (ljb)
February 1, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Hall, Boyd, Todd, and Chasity, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint and the amended complaint with any attachments, 1 & 18 , and a summons for these Defendants through the Craighead County Detention Center without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/1/2016. (jak)
August 21, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP Application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP Application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/21/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osby v. Craighead County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Osby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?