Glaze v. Grooms et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Defendant: Todd Grooms, Hines, T Bonner, J Thomas, Dexter, Stone, Ronnie Coleman, Milo, Does and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 3:2015cv00252
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 the unopposed recommendation; declining 12 Recommendation; and denying as moot 13 motion. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2016. (kdr)
June 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the Order granting Glaze in forma pauperis status, 11 . Glaze's custodian is not required as previously ordered, to collect money from his institutional account, or to send it to the Court. The Clerk is directed to return to Gla ze any funds received from him toward payment of the filing fee for this lawsuit. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this order to the Cuyahoga County Sheriff, Post Office Box 5600, Cleveland, OH 44101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/13/2016. (jak)
January 5, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the full filing and administrative fees, or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/5/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to Plaintiff. No later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff must submit the full $400 filing and administrative fees or file a fully completed and signed in forma pauperis application, along with the trust fund calculation sheet and certificate, signed by an authorized official. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/30/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. Grooms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?