Hunter v. Beck et al

Plaintiff: Stephen P Hunter
Defendant: Ron Beck, Costina Coleman, Walter Towne and G Stipanuk
Case Number: 3:2015cv00261
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 24 Order, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/8/2016. (jak)
January 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, on or before February 3, 2016, a response to Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructi ons in this Order. Plaintiff is advised failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in either all of the facts in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5 (c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/4/2016. (jak)
October 23, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the recommended partial disposition. Plaintiff Stephen Hunter may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against defendant G. Stipanuk. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Stipanuk and the U.S. Marshal is directed to s erve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on Stipanuk without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Hunter's negligence claims against Ron Beck, Costina Coleman, and Walter Towne are dismissed without prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/23/2015. (jak)
September 8, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff must, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, file an Amended Complaint containing the specified information. Plaintiff is reminded that this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, if he fails to timely and properly do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/8/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Beck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costina Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Towne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Stipanuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?