Silas v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Elijah Curtis Silas
Defendant: Mandy Childers and Lashun Cage
Case Number: 3:2015cv00269
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Silas's medication-related claims against Cage and Childress are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/8/2016. (jak)
October 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Silas wants to respond to the 22 Motion for Summary Judgment, then he must do so by 11/7/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2016. (jak)
January 4, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties need to complete more discovery before Childers and Cage can meaningfully respond to Silas's motion for summary judgment. The motion, 13 , is therefore denied without prejudice as premature. Defendants' motion, 14 , is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2016. (jak)
November 3, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)
October 6, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Silas has stated plausible claims that defendants Cage and Childers provided him inadequate medical care and he may proceed with these claims. Silas's claim that Sheriff Allen violated his constitutional rights is dismissed without prejudice. Bonner and Thomas are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Silas wants to proceed with claims against Defendants other than Childers and Cage, he must file an amended compl aint by 5 November 2015. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summons for Childers and Cage. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on Childers and Cage without prepayment of fees and costs or security. I f either defendant is no longer a Crittenden County Detention Center Employee, the individual responding to service must file the former employee's last known private mailing address under seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silas v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Curtis Silas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashun Cage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?