Wells v. Oakes et al

Plaintiff: Willie Wells
Defendant: Donald Oakes, Christopher Johnson, Johnson and James Presley
Case Number: 3:2015cv00300
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Prior to ruling on Defendants' 42 Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court would like Defendants to supplement their Motion concerning Plaintiff's claim, in the Supplement to his Complaint, 38 , that he was unlawfully incarcerated for 183 days based on charges which ultimately were dismissed. Defendants' supplemental brief should include any evidence and affidavits relevant to this allegation, and should be filed within 15 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff may file a supplemental response within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/5/2017. (jak)
September 28, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To better manage the Court's docket, the trial (if one is needed) will be held on 7/31/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2016. (jak)
June 22, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Amend which this Court construes as a Motion to Supplement. The Clerk shall docket entry number 26 as a Supplement to Plaintiff's Complaint. The parties shall complete discovery on or before October 22, 2016, and file any dispositive motions on or before November 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/22/2016. (jak)
May 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If a trial is needed in this case, this Court will hold it on 17 July 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/8/2016. (jak)
April 27, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket to reflect that the John Doe Defendant is Eric Arness Johnson. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare a summons for Johnson and the U.S. Marshal must serve the complaint, su mmons, the Court's 18 October 2015 Order, and this Order on Johnson without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Clerk is directed to redact the address of Johnson from Wells's motion on the public docket, 24 , and to place an unredacted copy of the motion under seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Wells lists a new address on his most recent motion, 13 . The Court directs the Clerk to update Wells's address on the docket sheet. Motion for copies, 13 granted. The Court directs the Clerk to send Wells a copy of each document filed in this case and a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2016. (jak)
November 6, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2015. (jak)
October 18, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining the objection to the Court's Order directing Plaintiff to amend, 4 . Plaintiff's embedded request for a stay and an extension are denied as moot. Wells's defamation allegation fails to state a 1983 claim. His claim fo r the value of lost personal property also fails to state a claim. Wells's vague allegation that the unlawful seizure of his vehicle violated his First Amended rights fails to state a claim as well. These claims are therefore dismissed without prejudice. Service is appropriate on Wells's Fourth Amendment claims against Oakes, Presley, and Christopher Johnson for unlawful arrest, search, and seizure. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the complaint, summons, and this Order on the defendants. Once Wells can identify the "Johnson, John Doe, Assisting Officer" defendant he should notify the Court so service can be ordered. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Oakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?