Hoggard v. Page et al

Plaintiff: Nathan Hoggard
Defendant: Roger Page, Jim Franklin and Arabi Cattle Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00323
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 110 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that all claims against the defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/9/2017. (jak)
April 7, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The jury trial scheduled to begin 5/1/2017 is cancelled and this case is removed from the trial docket. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/7/2017. (jak)
January 25, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/25/2017. (jak)
April 22, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' claims of aggravated assault and for punitive damages are dismissed. The claims of negligence as to all Defendants remain. The Court o rders the cases of Hoggard v. Arabi, 3:15CV00323-JM and Williams v. Arabi, 3:16CV00075 JM to be consolidated because the cases involve common questions of law and fact. Hoggard v. Arabi, 3:15CV00323 will be designated as the lead case. All future pleadings by the parties should be filed only in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/22/2016. (jak)
February 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Denying without prejudice 15 Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/16/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoggard v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Hoggard
Represented By: Kimberly B. Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Page
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Cole
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Franklin
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Cole
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arabi Cattle Company LLC
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Cole
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?