Koegel v. Sharp et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Lloyd Koegel
Defendant: Shela Sharp, Jerry Bradshaw, Ron Beck and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 3:2015cv00324
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Koegel's belated objections, 8 . Koegel's complaint still fails to state a claim. The Court therefore stands by its 22 December 2015 Order and Judgment, 6 & 7 . The Court directs the Clerk to send Koegel a copy of the d ocket sheet with this Order. Motion 9 denied as moot. If Koegel is requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, that motion is denied. The Court certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith, 6 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2016. (jak)
December 22, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Koegel's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2015. (jak)
November 19, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion on or before December 20, 2015. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP application, along with a prison calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koegel v. Sharp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lloyd Koegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shela Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?