Smith et al v. American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tim Smith and Constance Smith
Defendant: American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv00328
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT consistent with the Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that all claims against the defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/9/2017. (jak)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's are directed to provide full and complete responses, within twenty days of entry of this Order, to all interrogatories and requests for production of documents propounded by Defendant. Further, the deadline to disclose expert witnesses is extended to 11/7/2016 and the discovery deadline is extended to 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/8/2016. (jak)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/28/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Smith
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Smith
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heritage Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber M. Grand
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?