May v. Huckabee-York et al

Plaintiff: Shane Allen May
Defendant: Allison Huckabee-York, Donald Crittenden, B Rosemary, Steve Wright, R Farmer and T Moss
Case Number: 3:2015cv00352
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: May's conditions of confinement claims are dismissed without prejudice. May's inadequate medical care claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2016. (jak)
October 14, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within 15 days of the entry of this Order, a Response to Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate statement of disputed facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the i nstructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in either all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/14/2016. (jak)
April 1, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants Allison Huckabee, Rosemary Farmer, and Tonya Moss. The Clerk is also directed to terminate the name of Defendant B. Rosemary, as she is identified in the Answer as Rosemary Farmer (also originally sued as R. Farmer). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/1/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed 11 partial recommendation adopted. May's claims about improper conditions of confinement are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 02/01/2016. (rhm)
January 7, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for Defendants Allison Huckabee-York, Donald Crittenden, B. Rosemary, Steve Wright, R. Farmer, and T. Moss. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Second Amended Complaint, 10 , and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Huckabee-York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Allen May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Huckabee-York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Rosemary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?