Parker v. Cagle et al

Plaintiff: William Parker
Defendant: Blaine Cagle, Zach Croker and Greene County Detention Facility
Case Number: 3:2015cv00365
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 15 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/19/2016. (jak)
January 15, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Parker to notify the Court that he wants to proceed with this lawsuit, and if so, to file an amended complaint. His amended complaint may include one constitutional claim. If Mr. Parker fails to respond to this Court's order, the Court may conclude that he no longer seeks to pursue his claims. Unless he responds, he risks having his claims dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/15/2016. (jak)
November 23, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this lawsuit, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/23/2015. (jak)
November 13, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Parker. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Cagle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?