Hebert v. Craighead County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Denver Lee Hebert
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center and Matt Hall
Case Number: 3:2015cv00393
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 38 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/20/2016. (jak)
February 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Herbert to notify the Court of his new address within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this lawsuit under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/19/2016. (jak)
February 16, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety. Mr. Herbert's claims against Craighead County Detention Center are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/16/2016. (jak)
January 29, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Hall, Boyd, Foster, Webb, Bentley, and Reece. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, 1 , with any attachments, and a summons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/29/2016. (jak)
December 16, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP application and a jail account information sheet along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/16/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Lee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?