Williams et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Renetta Williams and Meleva Williams
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc and Dollar Tree Stores Inc #2907
Case Number: 3:2016cv00014
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ORDER: The Court made a mistake in 32 Order filed yesterday. The date is wrong - 2016 instead of 2017. The Court files this Amended Order to correct its error. Joint Report 31 noted and appreciated. The stay, 16 , is lifted. The Court gi ves its final approval as the resolution is fair, reasonable, and in the child's best interest. This Court will dismiss this case with prejudice unless a party seeks some other relief before 4/26/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/13/2017. (jak)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Joint report 31 noted and appreciated. The stay, 16 , is lifted. The Court gives its final approval as the resolution is fair, reasonable, and in the child's best interest. This Court will dismiss this case with prejudice unless a party seeks some other relief before 4/26/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2017. (jak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court would appreciate some more information before it sets a hearing. Please file a copy of the proposed settlement agreement under seal. The Court would appreciate a joint report on the issues raised within this Order by 8/3/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renetta Williams
Represented By: Melanie Renee' Yelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meleva Williams
Represented By: Melanie Renee' Yelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Represented By: Richard Evan Sorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc #2907
Represented By: Richard Evan Sorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?