Coleman et al v. Hall

Plaintiff: Darenzy Coleman, Lakhraj Manohar and Arlus Banks
Defendant: Matt Hall
Case Number: 3:2016cv00021
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/8/2016. (jak)
April 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 Recommendation. Coleman's claims are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2016. (jak)
March 15, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 Recommendation. Banks's claims are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/2016. (jak)
January 26, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose IFP applications along with a copy of this Order for Plaintiffs Coleman and Banks. Both Mr. Coleman and Banks must return a completed IFP application, including a n accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Mr. Manohar cannot proceed IFP in federal court absent an allegation that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. Mr. Manohar must pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days. Failure to pay the fee will result in the dismissal of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/26/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darenzy Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakhraj Manohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlus Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?