Friend v. Hoggard et al

Plaintiff: Earnest Edward Friend
Defendant: Luke Hoggard, Tonya Moss, Steve Wright and Allison Huckabee
Case Number: 3:2016cv00027
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 49 Order, Judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice with respect to plaintiff Earnest Friend's claims against defendants; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/8/2016. (jak)
August 3, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 and 34 Motions for Discovery and Motions for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/3/2016. (jak)
February 11, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of Defendant Luke Hoggard, as set forth in his answer, 9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/11/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend v. Hoggard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Edward Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Hoggard
Represented By: Paul D. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Moss
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wright
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Huckabee
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?