Ferguson v. Harrell et al
Plaintiff: Darrick L Ferguson, Jr
Defendant: T Harrell, T Reece, A Bently, Hicks, S Calaway and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2016cv00033
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT pursuant to 44 Order, Judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/2016. (jak)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER adopting the 38 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants Todd Harrell, Hicks, and S. Calaway is granted, and plaintiff Darrick L. Ferguson, Jr.'s claims against them are dismissed without prejudice. Harrell's motion to dismiss, 17 , is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/2016. (jak)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of defendants Arthur Bentley and Tracy Reece, as set forth in their answers, 22 and 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/10/2016. (jak)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of Defendant Todd Harrell, as set forth in his answer, 19 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/6/2016. (jak)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Ferguson a copy of this Order, the Court's February 2 Order, 2 , and an application for leave to proceed IFP at the Delta Regional Unit. Ferguson must pay the filing fee, or file an application for leave to pro ceed IFP no later than thirty days after this order's entry date. He is also ordered to file a notice of change of address. Ferguson's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/14/2016. (jak)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to plaintiff. Plaintiff must submit either the full $400 filing and administrative fees or file a fully completed and signed in forma pauperis application, along with the trust fund calculation sheet and certificate, within thirty days after the entry date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/2/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Harrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrick L Ferguson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Bently
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Calaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?