Manohar v. Baxter et al
Plaintiff: Lakhraj Manohar
Defendant: Baxter, Ollo and Vandergriff
Case Number: 3:2016cv00076
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED JUDGMENT pursuant 79 Amended Order, plaintiff Manohar's complaint is dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2020. (jak)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT pursuant to 74 Order, Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/13/2020. (jak)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT pursuant to 64 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/31/2020. (jak)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing Mr. Manohar, within 21 days from the entry of this Order, to confirm in writing through a filed status report his current mailing address. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/5/2020. (jak)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion for default judgment and demand for jury trial. The Court denies as moot the 34 Motion to expedite. The Court also orders Mr. Manohar to provide to the Court in writing within 45 days from the entry of this Order addresses where Lieutenant Baxter, Mr. Vandergriff, and Mr. Ollo may be served in conformity with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/15/2019. (jak)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Mr. Manohar's motion for default judgment; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint via certified mail with a return receipt requested and delivery restricted to the addressees defendants Lieutenant Baxter and Mr. Vandergriff; and directing Mr. Manohar to provide to the Court within 14 days confirmation of the address or updated address and contact information for Mr. Ollo. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/14/2019. (jbh)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion for default judgment. 22 Motion to expedite is denied as moot. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and complaint via mail with a return receipt requested and delivery restricted to defendants Lieutenant Baxter, Mr. Ollo, and Mr. Vandergriff. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/25/2018. (jak)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 11 MOTION for Service and denying as moot 15 MOTION to Expedite. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons using the information provided by Mr. Manohar regarding the defendants' last names and places of employment in his complaint, and the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas is directed to serve the defendants. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/25/2017. (jak)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Manohar to pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis for the Court's review and consideration within thirty days of the entry of this Order. If Mr. Manohar does not pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed in forma pauperis application within thirty days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/21/2016. (jak)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/16/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manohar v. Baxter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakhraj Manohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?