Long v. Short et al

Plaintiff: Gary Lee Long
Defendant: Chrissy Short and Tiger Commissary
Case Number: 3:2016cv00090
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The 2 complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2016. (jak)
July 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Gary Lee Long is directed to file his response to Tiger Commissary's discovery requests no later than 20 days after this Order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/25/2016. (jak)
July 6, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Gary Lee Long is directed to file his response to Short's discovery requests no later than 14 days after this order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/6/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Short et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrissy Short
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Commissary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?