Zaxby's Franchising LLC v. MJM Foods LLC

Plaintiff: Zaxby's Franchising LLC
Defendant: MJM Foods LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00137
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 24 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/2016. (jak)
June 6, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/6/2016. (jak)
May 25, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Plaintiff Zaxby's Franchising, LLC's motion for a temporary restraining order, 2 , is granted. A hearing for a preliminary injunction has been set for Wednesday, June 1, 2016, 10:30 a.m. at the federal courthouse in Jonesboro. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/25/2016. (jak)
May 23, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Though no formal entry of appearance has been made, plaintiff's counsel represents to the Court that attorney E.B. Chiles IV will be representing defendant MJM Foods LLC, in this matter. Because Mr. Chiles appears on the Court's recusal list, the case should be reassigned. The Clerk's office is directed to issue a notice of reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/23/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaxby's Franchising LLC v. MJM Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaxby's Franchising LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Puryear(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJM Foods LLC
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Joseph R. Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?