Stanton v. Nettleton School District et al

Plaintiff: Reva Marque Stanton
Defendant: Nettleton School District and Brian Carter
Case Number: 3:2016cv00179
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER placing under seal documents 1 through 6 . The Court directs the Plaintiff and all other parties in the future not to use the name of the minor in any document filed in the Clerk's office. Rather, the minor will be identified as "J DS". The Clerk will not accept for filing any document in which the name of the minor is disclosed. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, the amended complaint, and a copy of this Order upon the Nettleton School District and Brian Carter without cost to the plaintiff. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/26/2016. (jak)
July 25, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to change the docket to reflect that Stanton brings this action on behalf of "JDS, a Minor" and to redact the complaint accordingly. The document attached to the complaint should be filed under seal. The m otion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 1 , is granted. Stanton is directed to provide an amended complaint within thirty days from the entry of this Order that states as thoroughly and specifically the facts that she contends show that the de fendants acted illegally, and she must identify what each defendant did that renders that defendant liable to her or to her minor child. If she fails to do so, this action may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/2016. (jak)
July 22, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's attention to the fact that plaintiff is required to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of plaintiff's claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular mail and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/22/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Nettleton School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reva Marque Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nettleton School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?