Johnson v. Crittenden County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Lee Johnson
Defendant: John Cody, Logan, Watts, Williams, Davis, Franks and Mike Allen
Case Number: 3:2016cv00219
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/7/2017. (jak)
June 27, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Childress; and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve her with copies of the 1 Complaint, 22 supplement to complaint, and 38 Amended Complaint with any attachments, and a summons without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/27/2017. (jak)
June 20, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion. In his Amended Complaint, Mr. Johnson clarifies the claims made in his original complaint. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Defendants Cody and Allen as party Defendants. The Court cannot rule on 40 Motion without fi rst reviewing the proposed interrogatories. Mr. Johnson has 14 days to supplement his motion with the proposed interrogatories. Defendants will have 14 days from the date the supplement is filed to respond to Mr. Johnson's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/20/2017. (jak)
April 12, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties additional time to complete discovery up to 7/14/2017. Mr. Johnson's response to the Defendants' pending 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/12/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Crittenden County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cody
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franks
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?