Mross v. E&S Contracting Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Mross
Defendant: E&S Contracting Inc, Shaft Drillers International LLC, Mark McDaniels and Coastal Drilling East LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00223
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in accordance with Mr. Mross and Mr. Smith's stipulations, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice. The Court denies as moot all pending motions. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2017. (jak)
July 5, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/2017. (jak)
February 16, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This action is consolidated with Elton Smith v. E&S Contracting Inc., et al., Case No. 3:17-cv-00005 KGB. All parties are directed to make filings only in Jerry Mross v. E&S Contracting Inc., et al., Case No. 3:16-cv-00223 KGB, going forward. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file a copy of this Order in Elton Smith v. E&S Contracting, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:17-cv-00005-KGB. At this stage of the litigation, the Court determines that it wo uld be premature to determine that separate trials are necessary or appropriate. On a more fully developed record, the parties, if they choose to do so, may request that the Court reconsider this issue. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/16/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mross v. E&S Contracting Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Mross
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Represented By: Jared S. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&S Contracting Inc
Represented By: Antwan D. Phillips
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaft Drillers International LLC
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McDaniels
Represented By: Antwan D. Phillips
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Drilling East LLC
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?