Miller v. Broadway Health and Rehab LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lee Andre Miller
Defendant: Broadway Health and Rehab LLC, Broadway Health Holdings LLC, Arkansas SNF Operations Acquisition III LLC, Arkansas Nursing Home Acquisition LLC, CSCV Holdings II LLC, Capital Funding Group Inc, ADDIT LLC, SLC Professionals LLC and Compass Pointe Healthcare System LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00255
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/19/2018. (ljb)
February 21, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partly granting and partly denying 38 Motion to strike. Dr. Klein's testimony will be limited to the opinions in the first disclosure. 39 Motion is denied as moot. 41 Motion is granted; punitive damages and joint venture are no lon ger issues in this case. 43 Motion is granted with a caveat; the estate must give Broadway, and the Court, notice of any such proposed evidence by 2/28/2018. 45 Motion is granted; Expert testimony by Broadway's caregivers is out, unless the door is opened and testimony about the facts is in. 47 Motion is partly granted and partly denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2018. (jak)
February 13, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partly denying and partly granting with caveats 18 Motion for judgment. 22 Motion for partial summary judgment granted on punitive damages and, on the claims issues, partly denied and partly granted with caveats. 25 Motion for partial summary judgment by the non-facility defendants granted. The case will proceed to trial, first-out on 3/5/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Broadway Health and Rehab LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Andre Miller
Represented By: David A. Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Health and Rehab LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Health Holdings LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas SNF Operations Acquisition III LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Nursing Home Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSCV Holdings II LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Represented By: Hayden Wilbourn Shurgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Funding Group Inc
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDIT LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Professionals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Pointe Healthcare System LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?