Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC v. Terrafirm Construction LLC
Plaintiff: Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC
Defendant: Terrafirm Construction LLC
Counter_claimant: Terrafirm Construction LLC
Counter_defendant: Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00297
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT pursuant to 43 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that all of the claims and counterclaims in this case are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/3/2018. (jak)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion. The Court will issue by separate Order an Amended Scheduling Order to set a new trial date and new deadlines based upon the new trial date. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/7/2017. (jak)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Atlas indicates that, during the pendency of the action, it changed its name from Mining, Rock Excavation and Construction LLC. Atlas requests that the Court and parties effectuate this change in all pleadings, filings, and records of the Court. The Court directs the Clerk to change the name of the entity in the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/24/2017. (jak)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC v. Terrafirm Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC
Represented By: David L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrafirm Construction LLC
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Terrafirm Construction LLC
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mining Rock Excavation and Construction LLC
Represented By: David L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?