Harris v. Harmon et al
Plaintiff: Greg L Harris
Defendant: Harmon, Clark and Ronnie Coleman
Case Number: 3:2016cv00298
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT pursuant to 38 Memorandum and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/14/2017. (jak)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within fifteen days of the entry of this Order a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order; and a Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/27/2017. (jak)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 5 Partial Recommendation. Harris agrees with Magistrate Judge Kearney's recommendation. His claims against Allen are therefore dismissed without prejudice. And his claims for damages based on the extension of his sentence, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2016. (jak)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Administrator of the Crittenden County Detention Facility shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee of $34.33 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of the Court until the total filing fee is collected. Service is appropriate for Defendants Harmon, Clark, and Coleman. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and summons on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Crittenden County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg L Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?