Rice v. Kindall
Plaintiff: Patrick Rice
Defendant: Mike Kindall, Kim Muse, Susan Cox and Steve Rorex
Case Number: 3:2016cv00299
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT consistent with 17 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/8/2017. (jak)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting 9 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Muse, Cox, and Rorex are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/2016. (jak)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail a 1983 Complaint form to Plaintiff with this Order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this Order, marked it as "Amended Complai nt", and file within 30 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's amended complaint as it now stands is deficiency and may be dismissed after 30 days from the date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/9/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?