Brantley v. UPS Ground Freight Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kimberley D Brantley
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc, Optimum Staffing Inc, Robert L Woodall and John Does
Case Number: 3:2016cv00352
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 JUDGMENT: Brantley's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. All other claims, including Bridgefield's claim in intervention, are dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 12/13/2019 to enforce the settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/2019. (jbh)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER: UPS and Brantley have informally advised the Court that Brantley, UPS, Optimum, and Woodall have settled their dispute. Congratulations. The Third Amended Final Scheduling Order, 137 ,is suspended and trial on the merits is cancelled. Interv enor Bridgefield's claims are as yet unresolved, but are now solely between Brantley and Bridgefield. Joint status report from those parties due by 10/4/2019. One day hearing to resolve any made-whole issues 10/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Jonesboro. The Court will withhold Judgment until this issue is addressed. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/2019. (jak)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Bobby McDaniel, Brett McDaniel, Adam Weeks, Breean Walas, Amanda Porbeck, Roman Galas, Robert A. Cox, Ronna Kinsella, Jamie Jones, and J.C. Baker to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Jonesboro Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse for a hearing in this case on 9/18/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/17/2019. (jak)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER: The Court much appreciates Brantley's clarification of Barry Grant's treatment of income taxes in his calculations, and Optimum's response, No. 361 & 362 . Grant's testimony on the loss of financial contributions is ther efore excluded. Grant may testify on other topics not dependent on numbers affected by income taxes. The Court has viewed the animation videos produced by Jackson Reconstruction. They're well done. But, after reconsideration, the Court confirms its bench ruling excluding them. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/30/2019. (jak)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate No. 268 as a separate motion. 251 Motion to Intervene is granted as modified. The request to join this dispute on the merits is untimely. The Court exercises its discretion in these circumstances and grants limited permissive intervention. Bridgefield may participate on three issues: any settlement, the terms of any Judgment, and the existence and enforcement of any lien. Bridgefield must file another proposed complaint, addressing only these issues rather than the underlying merits, and acknowledging its contingent interest, by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2019. (jak)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 131 Joint motion to continue following the 135 Hearing. A Third Amended Final Scheduling Order will follow. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2018. (jak)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting with a modification and clarification 130 Motion. Subject to Amended General Order 54, Bobby McDaniel, Brett McDaniel, Robb Helt, Adam Weeks, Amanda Porbeck, Rebecca Powers, Dorothy Clay Sims, Ronna D Kinsella, Robert A. Cox, Jill Br anin, and Kristen Williams are authorized to bring cell phones, laptops, and electronic devices into the Jonesboro Federal Building for the trial in this case. One-week trial scheduled for 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2018. (jak)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2018. (jak)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' proposed protective order. Please make the changes noted on the attached draft and send a clean draft for final review and entry. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/15/2017. (jak)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 38 and 41 Motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. UPS Ground Freight Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley D Brantley
Represented By: Bobby R. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum Staffing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?