Lawrence County School District v. McDaniel
Plaintiff: Lawrence County School District
Defendant: Marion McDaniel
Case Number: 3:2017cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT consistent with 54 Order, the Arkansas Department of Education's administrative order is affirmed, judgment is entered for defendant Marion McDaniel, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/30/2018. (jak)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 14 Motion. Accordingly, third-party defendants Key and the State Board of Education are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/26/2017. (jak)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 27 Motion. Defendant Belcher is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence County School District v. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence County School District
Represented By: Donn H. Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion McDaniel
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?