Caughron v. Upsher-Smith Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Caughron
Defendant: Upsher-Smith Laboratories Inc and Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv00021
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2018. (jak)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 41 & 43 Motions. Caughron has one main claim - alleged failure to warn Mr. Caughron's doctor - and a derivative claim for lost consortium. An Initial Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/4/2017. (jak)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER partly granting and partly denying Motions 5 and 27 . Any amended complaint due by 8/1/2017. And it would be most helpful if Caughron would plead about Upsher-Smith and Taro individually, rather than saying "defendants" did X, Y, or Z. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caughron v. Upsher-Smith Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Caughron
Represented By: Rhonda Gail Davis
Represented By: Edward K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upsher-Smith Laboratories Inc
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?