Alston v. Swift
Plaintiff: James Alston
Defendant: Gary Swift, Arkansas Department of Community Correction and Charlene Davidson Henrey
Case Number: 3:2017cv00064
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Alston hasn't paid the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees or filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; and the time to do so has passed, No. 18 . To the extent Alston's notice also sought leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, No. 17 , that motion is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2017. (jak)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Motion for order. The Court directs the Clerk to resend Alston copies of docket entries No. 13 , 14 , 17 , & 18 with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/2017. (jak)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT: Alston's complaint and amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2017. (jak)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Alston hasn't paid the $400 filing and administrative fees or filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis. He must do one or the other by 5/8/2017. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Alston an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Davidson Henrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?