Morrow v. Rorex et al
Plaintiff: Richard L Morrow
Defendant: Steve Rorex, Becky Hitts, Kim Muse and Larry Mills
Case Number: 3:2017cv00087
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT consistent with the Order that was entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/28/2017. (jak)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Defendants Hitts and Rorex have 14 days to notify the Court whether Defendant Muse is a former employee of Poinsett County Detention Center and, if so, to provide the Court with Defendant Muse's last known address under seal. Defendant Mills will have until 7/5/2017 to respond to Mr. Morrow's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/21/2017. (jak)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for each Defendant. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the 2 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint, and a summons for each Defendant without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/27/2017. (jak)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Morrow to file an amended complaint within 30 days. His failure to comply with this Court's order may result in the dismissal of some or all of his claims, without prejudice. Local Rule 5.5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/24/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Rorex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Represented By: John R. Myers
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitts
Represented By: John R. Myers
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?