Johnson v. Instant Auto Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Francois Johnson
Defendant: Instant Auto Credit Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv00115
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT pursuant to 8 Order, Johnson's claims against defendants Instant Auto Credit Corporation, Abernathy Motor Company, and Carl Oliver are dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/25/2018. (jak)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 9 Motion to dismiss ((Johnson II, Dkt. No. 9). The Court dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claim under TILA against Mr. Oliver and dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claim under GLBA against Mr. Oliver. The Cou rt also dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claims under TILA against Abernathy and Instant Auto and dismisses Mr. Johnson's claims under GLBA against Abernathy and Instant Auto. The Court also dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johns ons claims under the FTCA and Dodd-Frank Act against Instant Auto. Mr. Johnson has 21 days from the entry of this Order to move the Court for leave to amend. If Mr. Johnson does not seek leave to amend his complaint during that time, the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Mr. Johnson's remaining state law claims and dismiss without prejudice those claims, as well. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2018. (jak)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court orders the parties to show cause within 10 days of the entry date of this Order why the present suit should not be consolidated with Case No. 3:17-cv-00127. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/12/2018. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Instant Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instant Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?