Johnson v. Abernathy Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Francois Johnson
Defendant: Abernathy Motor Company and Carl Oliver
Case Number: 3:2017cv00127
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT pursuant to 26 Order entered in lead case 3:17-cv-00115, Johnson's claims against defendants Instant Auto Credit Corporation, Abernathy Motor Company, and Carl Oliver are dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/25/2018. (jak)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER consolidating this case with and into Johnson v. Instant Auto Credit Corp., Case No. 3:17-cv-00115 KGB. All parties are directed to make filings only in the Instant Auto Credit Corp. case going forward. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2018. (jak)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Mr. Johnson is ordered to supplement his affidavit in support of his motion for default with information sufficient to allow the Court to assess service under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or in the alternative provide updated information to the U.S. Marshal's office so that they may re-attempt service upon Abernathy. The parties are ordered to show cause within 10 days of the entry of this Order, why this action should not be consolidated with case No. 3:17-cv-00115 KGB.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/12/2018. (jak)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court needs more information on his income and expenses. Johnson must file a new motion to proceed IFP - with complete information about income and expenses - by 7/5/2017. If Johnson doesn't provide more information, the Court will dismiss his case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/7/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Abernathy Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abernathy Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?