McDaniel v. Greene County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Kyle B McDaniel
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Department, Tarrin Huggins and Susan Baird
Case Number: 3:2017cv00155
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 45 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. If McDaniel wants to pursue his appeal, then he must either pay the $505 appellate filing and docketing fee in this Court or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, No. 42 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2019. (jak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 37 & 38 Motions to amend complaint and for appointed counsel. The Court dismissed McDaniel's complaint; and nothing in his new papers warrants relief from the Judgment and final Order, 27 & 28 . This case is closed. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2019. (jak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Belated Appeal. McDaniel's lack of legal knowledge is not a sufficient reason to reopen the time to appeal. Further, the Court certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith, No. 27 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2019. (jak)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT: McDaniel's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting 4 Partial Recommendation and overruling McDaniel's 14 and 15 objections. The Doe defendants have been identified as Huggins and Baird. McDaniel's individual claims against them go forward, but he can't sue the department under 1983. The Greene County Sheriff's Department is therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Greene County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle B McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrin Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?