Kilpatrick v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Pete Kilpatrick
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2017cv00183
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this day, judgment is entered for the Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/10/2018. (ljb)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion. The Commissioner is given up to and including 3/2/2018 to file a supplemental transcript in this case. The brief from plaintiff Kilpatrick is due no later then 14 days after the filing of the supplemental transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/12/2018. (jak)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion. Plaintiff is given up to and including 1/13/2018 to file his brief. The brief from the Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is due 42 days from the filing of plaintiff's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/13/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilpatrick v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Kilpatrick
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?