Spears v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: James Spears, Jr
Defendant: Dale Cook, Andrew Harris, Clayburn Hicks, Luther Whitfield, Stipanny, Kris Stankiewicz, Ronnie McDermott, Shawn Rainey, Matt Malone and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv00235
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT: Spears's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/2018. (jak)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare new summonses for Defendants Whitfield and Hicks. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these Defendants with a copy of the 2 Complaint and 5 Amended Complaint, along with any attachments, and summonses, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. These Defendants should be served at their last-known addresses as provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/15/2017. (jak)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing the remaining defendants to provide the last-known addresses for Defendant Whitfield and Hicks to the Court, under seal, within 14 days. The Clerk is directed to prepare a new summons for Defendant Stipanuk and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve Defendant Stipanuk with a copy of the complaint, amended complaint, along with any attachments, and a summons without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/7/2017. (jak)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting 6 Partial Recommendation as modified and sustaining Spears's 6 objection. McDermott, Rainey, and Malone defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The claims against Hicks, Cook, Harris, Whitfield, Stipanuk, and Stankiewicz proceed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/31/2017. (jak)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding that service is now proper. The Clerk is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Cook, Harris, Hicks, Whitfield, Stipanuk, and Stankiewicz. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and 5 Amended Complaint with any attachments and summonses for these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/13/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spears, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayburn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stipanny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Stankiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?