Stevens v. Craighead County et al
Plaintiff: Beau Stevens
Defendant: Craighead County and Crittenden County
Case Number: 3:2017cv00264
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Stevens's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Stevens's mail is being returned, No. 3 . He must update his address with the Clerk by 11/13/2017. If he doesn't, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2017. (jak)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Craighead County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?