Williams v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Kentrall Dewayne Williams
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center and Scott Ellington
Case Number: 3:2017cv00339
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT pursuant to 5 Order, Plaintiff Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied and an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and Judgment is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/18/2018. (jak)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/8/2018. (jak)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Williams to submit within 30 days of the entry fate of this order either the $400 statutory filing fee or a properly completed Application to Proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit, with the required calculation sheet b y an authorized official of the detention center. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Williams an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit and a filing fee calculation sheet. 2 Motion for status update is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/26/2018. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentrall Dewayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?