Coffey v. Thomas, et al.
Appellant: Leslie Dwight Coffey
Appellee: A Jan Thomas, Jr and CNR Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00108
Filed: June 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: The appeal is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/7/2018. (jak)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion as modified. The Court vacates its 5 Judgment and reopens the case. Coffey must file his brief by 8/17/2018; the Appellees must respond by 9/17/2018; and Coffey may reply by 9/28/2018. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. Coffey's address is now 1158 Black Branch Road, Rabun Gap, Georgia 30568. The Court directs the Clerk to mail this Order to Coffey's new Georgia address and his old Arkansas one. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2018. (jak)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: The appeal is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2018. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Thomas, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leslie Dwight Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: A Jan Thomas, Jr
Represented By: A. Jan Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CNR Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jeannette A. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?