Ransom v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Nico Dimitries Ransom
Defendant: Does Booking Staff and Medical Staff, Craighead County Detention Center, Craighead County Detention Center, Tinner, L Mason, Gibson, A Moore, H O'Brien, Fair, Keith Bowers and Does Booking Staff, Nurses and Medical Staff, Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00162
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Fair served on 10/4/2018. (fjg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Bowers served on 10/4/2018. (fjg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Keith Bowers, Gibson, L Mason, A Moore, H O'Brien, Tinner.(Jones, Kolton)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kolton Jones on behalf of Keith Bowers, Gibson, L Mason, A Moore, H O'Brien, Tinner (Jones, Kolton)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #6 unopposed partial recommendation; and dismissing with prejudice Ransom's claims against the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/2018. (cmn)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tinner served on 10/3/2018. (fjg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. L Mason served on 10/3/2018. (fjg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. A Moore served on 10/3/2018. (fjg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gibson served on 10/3/2018. (fjg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Ms. Ransom's claims against Defendant Craighead County Detention Center be dismissed, with prejudice. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/28/2018. (jak)
September 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers, Fair, Gibson, L Mason, A Moore, H O'Brien, Tinner and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Ms. Ransom's custodians are obligated to collect monthly payments from Ms. Ransom's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the total $350 is paid. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Facility. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summonses for defendants Bowers, Mason, Moore, Tinner, Gibson, O'Brien, and Fair and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, and summonses on these defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/27/2018. (jak)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nico Dimitries Ransom. (kdr)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nico Dimitries Ransom. (ljb)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS: You have not filed an application to proceed IFP or paid the filing fee. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an application to proceed IFP and a jail account information sheet along with a copy of this order. You must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/30/2018. (mcz)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Nico Dimitries Ransom. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Booking Staff and Medical Staff, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinner
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Mason
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Moore
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H O'Brien
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Represented By: Kolton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Booking Staff, Nurses and Medical Staff, Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nico Dimitries Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?