Mitchell v. Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Roger Mitchell
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, Marty Boyde, Black, H Hogan and Keith Bowiers
Case Number: 3:2018cv00164
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Roger Mitchell re #7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. (fjg)
October 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to Black, H Hogan and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the #6 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants Black and Hogan without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/15/2018. (jak)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #1 and #6 Defendants Bowiers, Boyde, and Craighead County Detention Center be DISMISSED from this action, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/12/2018. (lmc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Roger Mitchell. (cel)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's current custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $6.58 from Plaintiff's institutional account and forward to the Clerk of the Court along with future monthly installments until the total $350.00 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/18/2018. (jak)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/18/2018. (lmc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Mitchell. (ljb)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff Mitchell to submit either the $400 filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/2018. (jak)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center filed by Roger Mitchell. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?