Friar v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Lorri Friar
Defendant: Does Casey, Sherry, Rayanne, Kara Black, Sandy Edwards, Keith Bowers, Selinaes, Casey Gibson and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00190
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lorri Friar re 1983 complaint form. (fjg)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #6 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend her complaint, she may submit the new complaint in accordance with this order, mark it as "Second Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Certain claims in Plaintiff's complaint and first amended complaint, as currently pled, are deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/13/2018. (lej)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorri Friar. (ljb)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #3 . Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days of the date of this order either: (1) the statutory filing fee of $400; or (2) a proper and complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, with the required calculation sheet and certified copy of her trust fund account statement for the preceding six months. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/23/2018. (lej)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Lorri Friar.(cel)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorri Friar. (cel)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either (1) the statutory filing fee of $400; or (2) a properly completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the detention center at which she is confined, within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2018. (lej)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lorri Friar. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friar v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Casey, Sherry, Rayanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selinaes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorri Friar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?