Iverson v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Davanta Iverson
Defendant: E Stanfield and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00204
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Davanta Iverson re 1983 Complaint form. (fjg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Davanta Iverson re #4 Order. (fjg)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER staying the ruling on #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, pending receipt of an Amended Complaint; directing the Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/20/2018. (kdr)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Davanta Iverson. (ljb)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Iverson to submit either the $400 filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2018. (jak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Davanta Iverson.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davanta Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?