Selvy v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Flando Selvy
Defendant: Mike Allen and Ronnie Coleman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #4 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/18/2019. (ljb)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Flando Selvy's motion to dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/18/2019. (ljb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to be Removed from Complaint by Flando Selvy. (kdr)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Selvy to either submit the $400 filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion together with the filing fee calculation sheet, and a 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/9/2019. (jak)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Flando Selvy. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selvy v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flando Selvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?