Webster v. Pigg
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Pigg
Case Number: 3:2019cv00060
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2019. (jak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Webster's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jak)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Webster must pay the filing fee, but over time. The Court won't assess an initial partial filing fee but Webster's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order the Warden of the Tucker Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Webster's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jak)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster (kbc)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for more time to file an in forma pauperis application. Webster must pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certified calculation sheet by 5/30/2019. Webster's embedded request to amend his complaint, #4 , is denied without prejudice. Webster may not send one paper for filing in several cases at one time. The Court directs the Clerk not to docket any more multiple-case filings from Webster. If the Clerk receives a proposed filing from Webster that involves more than one of his cases, then the Clerk must return the paper to Webster with a request to specify which one case the paper should be filed in. The Clerk should also send Webster another copy of this Order with the returned paper. The Court also directs the Clerk to mail Webster an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a blank 1983 complaint form. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/30/2019. (jak)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster. (jak)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Webster to either pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 4/25/2019. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Webster an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/25/2019. (jak)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/25/2019. (jak)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pigg filed by Gary Leon Webster. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Pigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?