Whitlock v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Betty Whitlock
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 7/18/2019. Defendant Brief due 42 days after the day Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/6/2019. (cfd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re #8 Notice (Other), #7 Answer to Complaint. Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (jbh) (Documents w/restricted access added as attachments on 6/4/2019 for review by Court users only.) (jbh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #7 Answer to Complaint Conventional Filing of Administrative Transcript (Newman, Melinda)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Newman, Melinda)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R. Newman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Newman, Melinda)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty Whitlock. Social Security Administration served on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/1/2019. (jak)
March 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/26/2019. (jak)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Betty Whitlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Betty Whitlock.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Whitlock
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Melinda R. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?