Williams v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Irvin Williams
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, T Raymond, Keith Bowers, Brown and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond.(Davis, JaNan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Davis on behalf of Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond (Davis, JaNan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. T Raymond served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marty Boyd served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Bowers served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
April 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for defendants Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, and T. Raymond and the United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of #6 Amended Complaint and summons on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/26/2019. (jak)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATION recommending that Williams' claims based on verbal remarks and racial bias be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is also recommended that Williams' claims against Brown be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/26/2019. (jak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Marshall Irvin Williams. (ljb) (Docket text modified on 4/25/2019 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
April 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT". (jak)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint conforming to this Order within 30 days. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Williams a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/17/2019. (jak)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marshall Irvin Williams.(kdr)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court does not assess an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward them to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Sheriff. The Court directs Williams to file an amended complaint within 30 days that names the defendants he seeks to sue, explains how they violated his constitutional rights, and describes how he was injured as a result. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Williams a blank 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/10/2019. (jak)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center, filed by Marshall Irvin Williams.(kdr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marshall Irvin Williams. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Raymond
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?