Loudermilk v. Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Andrew Scott Loudermilk
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00103
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Andrew Scott Loudermilk re #6 Recommended Disposition. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Loudermilk's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's #5 Order to amend his complaint. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2019. (csf)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Mr. Loudermilk has 30 days to file an Amended Complaint to specifically identify, and name as defendants, the individuals who he alleges violated his constitutional rights, and explain whether those individuals were aware of the alleged unconstitutional conditions and how they caused him to suffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/18/2019. (csf)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Andrew Scott Loudermilk. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will not assess an initial partial payment. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the $350 filing fee by deducting monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forwarding them to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/12/2019. (jak)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center, filed by Andrew Scott Loudermilk.(kdr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Scott Loudermilk. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loudermilk v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Scott Loudermilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?