Warren v. Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Marcus Sinclair Warren
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, Keith Harrold, T Raymond, Keith Bowers, Brown and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #23 Recommended Disposition. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include that objections to the recommendation must be filed within 14 days as marked on the Order. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Warren's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's 5/20/2019 Order requiring him to update his address. Objections to this Recommendation must be filed within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/2019. (jak) (Docket text modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marcus Sinclair Warren re #8 Amended Complaint. (fjg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marcus Sinclair Warren re #9 Order, #10 Partial Recommended Disposition. (fjg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marcus Sinclair Warren re Notice of Docket Correction. (jbh)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marcus Sinclair Warren re #13 Order. (fjg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint and #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond.(Davis, JaNan) (Docket text modified on 5/31/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Davis on behalf of Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond (Davis, JaNan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marty Boyd served on 5/17/2019. (fjg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Bowers served on 5/17/2019. (fjg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. T Raymond served on 5/17/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Mail Returned. Mr. Warren is directed to notify the Court of his new address within 30 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2019. (csf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marcus Sinclair Warren re #11 Notice to the Court. (fjg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to the Court by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (ljb)
May 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Warren's claims against Defendants Brown and Harold be dismissed, without prejudice. Claims brought on behalf of other inmates, and claims for release from custody should also be dismissed without prejudice. Claims arising from Defendants' use of profane and threatening language, however, should be dismissed with prejudice. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/2/2019. (jak)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Bowers, Boyd, and Raymond. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of #2 Complaint with any attachments, #5 , #6 , #8 Amended Complaints, and summonses on the defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/2/2019. (jak) (Docket text modified on 5/3/2019 to correct typographical error.)(cmn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (llg)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate the Detention Center as a party defendant. Mr. Warren must again amend his complaints to include additional factual allegations. Mr. Warren has 30 days to file his third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/23/2019. (jak)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (llg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (ljb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will not assess an initial partial payment. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the entire filing fee is paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/12/2019. (jak)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center, filed by Marcus Sinclair Warren.(kdr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Sinclair Warren. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Sinclair Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Harrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Raymond
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?