Webster v. Doe

Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00110
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (kdr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Webster's complaint is dismissed without prejudice #11 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/2019. (kdr)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court until the $350 filing fee is paid in full; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Warden of the Tucker Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Webster's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a strike. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/2019. (kdr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster (kbc)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for more time to file an in forma pauperis application. Webster must pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certified calculation sheet by 5/30/2019. Webster's embedded request to amend his complaint, #6 , is denied without prejudice. Webster may not send one paper for filing in several cases at one time. The Court directs the Clerk not to docket any more multiple-case filings from Webster. If the Clerk receives a proposed filing from Webster that involves more than one of his cases, then the Clerk must return the paper to Webster with a request to specify which one case the paper should be filed in. The Clerk should also send Webster another copy of this Order with the returned paper. The Court also directs the Clerk to mail Webster an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a blank 1983 complaint form.Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/30/2019. (jak)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time and NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Leon Webster.(jak)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to #4 Supplemental Complaint filed by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT filed by Gary Leon Webster. (llg)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Webster to pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 5/17/2019. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Webster an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2019. (jak)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2019. (jak)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe filed by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?